Financial history ST BENEDICTS TRUST

Charity number: 292710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £4.18k £3.89k £11.45k £3.65k £3.16k
Total expenditure £9.00k £8.91k £9.40k £6.72k £9.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A