Accounts and annual returns NORTH LONDON RUDOLF STEINER SCHOOL

Charity number: 292776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 01 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 10 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 20 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 21 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window