SOUTH-EAST LONDON BAITUL AZIZ (MASJID AND MADRASSA) ISLAMIC CULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 292922
Charity reporting is overdue by 396 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 396 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 396 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 December 2019 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 December 2019 58 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 June 2017 On time Download