SOUTH-EAST LONDON BAITUL AZIZ (MASJID AND MADRASSA) ISLAMIC CULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 292922
Charity reporting is overdue by 393 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £201.39k £222.48k £234.66k £223.72k £242.54k
Total expenditure £105.56k £95.60k £117.85k £118.33k £135.57k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A