Financial history THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF OROT

Charity number: 292955
Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £267 £8.69k £0 £11.11k £11.28k
Total expenditure £74 £11.34k £60 £63 £21.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A