Accounts and annual returns LONDON MEIKANDAR AADHEENAM TRUST

Charity number: 293007
Charity reporting is overdue by 233 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 March 2024 497 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 June 2022 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 June 2022 601 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 February 2020 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required