Financial history LONDON MEIKANDAR AADHEENAM TRUST

Charity number: 293007
Charity reporting is overdue by 236 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £345 £316 £303 £223 £6
Total expenditure £150 £120 £80 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A