THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ENGINEERING

Charity number: 293074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £29.25m £27.41m £31.52m £36.75m £52.88m
Total expenditure £23.55m £27.37m £31.80m £37.72m £50.40m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.40m £11.74m £23.80m £28.60m £41.54m
Income - Donations and legacies £5.78m £1.94m £1.46m £1.63m £1.68m
Income - Other trading activities £1.91m £912.15k £1.45m £1.65m £1.60m
Income - Charitable activities £20.14m £22.98m £27.01m £31.90m £47.96m
Income - Endowments £0 £1.94m £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.41m £1.58m £1.61m £1.58m £1.63m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £611.90k £0 £0 £0 £434.66k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.97m £26.22m £30.19m £36.03m £48.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.48m £1.11m £1.53m £1.59m £1.62m
Expenditure - Governance £95.95k £40.33k £32.62k £0 £64.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £14.57m £16.01m £0 £28.94m
Expenditure - Investment management £183.32k £173.88k £256.62k £0 £142.78k
Expenditure - Other £95.95k £40.33k £89.45k £92.82k £53.98k