Financial history ST MARY STAR OF THE SEA PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 293744
Charity reporting is overdue by 713 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.15k £3.01k £2.64k £1.35k £1.87k
Total expenditure £5.18k £3.36k £2.45k £1.14k £2.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A