Financial history FAMILY IN TRUST

Charity number: 293865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £92.43k £496.84k £337.20k £204.73k £115.73k
Total expenditure £104.18k £125.03k £117.51k £110.71k £99.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £85.26k £81.00k £72.00k £78.00k £73.37k