MAPLE LEAF TRUST

Charity number: 294037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Courtney Lay Trustee 11 December 2019 None on record
JENNIFER TRIPP BLACK Trustee 22 November 2016 None on record
Ashley Gallant Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Douglas Ray McPhee Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
JERRY DEL MISSIER Trustee 06 May 2015
CHORDOMA UK Received: On time
Scott Daniel McVittie Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
ROBERT JAMES BRANT Chair 24 June 2019
THE YORK UNIVERSITY (CANADA) TRUST Received: 54 days late
THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO (UK) FOUNDATION Received: On time