Financial history THE SOUTH INDIAN MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 294394
Charity reporting is overdue by 1329 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £7.14k £7.87k £7.30k £7.31k £7.37k
Total expenditure £3.24k £8.79k £2.83k £8.42k £2.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A