Tavistock Local History Society

Charity number: 294593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.82k £2.42k £12.55k £2.61k £4.98k
Total expenditure £2.27k £2.64k £2.66k £3.52k £4.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A