Trustees Tavistock Local History Society
Charity number: 294593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Gerald Collinge | Chair | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Cripps | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sharon Jane Gedye | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Catherine Wilton | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Dawn Borrow | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Honor Smith | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Vernon Bellers | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jayne Wright | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Cole | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Roy Vigars | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.