SOCIETY FOR ANGLO-CHINESE UNDERSTANDING LIMITED

Charity number: 294651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.86k £7.02k £6.19k £5.90k £7.56k
Total expenditure £4.43k £5.06k £6.40k £4.35k £4.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A