MANNA SOCIETY

Charity number: 294691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 07 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time Download