MANNA SOCIETY

Charity number: 294691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £434.73k £562.77k £439.10k £444.40k £523.02k
Total expenditure £477.19k £454.78k £480.24k £490.70k £468.17k
Income from government contracts £55.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £55.00k £55.00k £55.00k £72.76k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £502.31k N/A N/A £520.05k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £55.00k N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £2.73k N/A N/A £2.97k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £106.89k N/A N/A £46.31k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £448.49k N/A N/A £462.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £6.29k N/A N/A £6.14k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.12k N/A N/A £3.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0