SOUTH MORETON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 294754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £93.77k £102.97k £110.88k £72.14k £100.89k
Total expenditure £80.76k £91.91k £117.04k £75.08k £84.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A