SOUTH MORETON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 294754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 17 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 17 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 26 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 03 April 2018 On time Download