THE KINGSTHORPE MOORS TRUST

Charity number: 294844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.05k £3.60k £6.39k £4.59k £3.90k
Total expenditure £8.86k £5.57k £4.29k £2.56k £3.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A