WOODHATCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £127.67k £24.65k £29.42k £11.68k £13.06k
Total expenditure £120.10k £34.37k £33.25k £12.53k £12.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A