Financial history KENT KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £29.25k £27.71k £15.82k £22.39k £17.88k
Total expenditure £26.62k £26.26k £29.78k £26.12k £21.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £9.19k