Accounts and annual returns KENT KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 01 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 22 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 23 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 23 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window