Governing document ST GEORGE'S BRISTOL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1986, AS AMENDED 27 OCTOBER 1997 AND 14 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED 11 FEBRUARY 2005 AND 6 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL AND NEIGHBOURING AREA THE ART OF MUSIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE SAID ART AND ITS STUDY AND PRACTICE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BRISTOL AND NEIGHBOURING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.