Trustees ST GEORGE'S BRISTOL

Charity number: 295178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maria Crayton Trustee 25 March 2024
BRISTOL GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Received: On time
IAN OXLEY Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
ROLAND HORNE Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
SALLIE BLANKSNASH Trustee 29 January 2024
None on record
Katherine Branch Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
Christian Cull Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
Madeline Toy Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
Mark Bowers Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
Paul Kenyon Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
Douglas Bott Trustee 30 January 2023
ABO TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Anna Louise Farthing Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
Stephanie Effiong Udoh Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
Chris Ladkin Trustee 12 June 2019
None on record
BEN HEALD Trustee 25 October 2013
None on record