Financial history VOCATIONAL TRAINING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 295192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £9.63m £9.62m £8.65m £9.61m £11.14m
Total expenditure £10.62m £10.63m £10.92m £8.77m £10.64m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.00k £50.00k £565.13k £188.29k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £142.74k £36.78k £565.13k £188.29k £0
Income - Charitable activities £9.27m £9.35m £7.90m £9.24m £10.98m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £218.06k £237.09k £188.60k £174.85k £167.81k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.05m £10.58m £10.68m £8.62m £10.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £50.07k £50.72k £240.15k £142.72k £499.95k
Expenditure - Governance £86.48k £0 £223.23k £261.23k £211.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £75.00k £75.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £50.07k £50.72k £111.80k £57.90k £57.62k
Expenditure - Other £517.39k £0 £0 £0 £0