Trustees VOCATIONAL TRAINING CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 295192

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Sworder | Chair | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lee Mandley | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Joanne Houghton | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Mark Winkley | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lysa Robin Schwartz | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Carlin | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Louise Quinn | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Mondon | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Armanda Shepperson | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Anne Lewis-Orr | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Stephanie-Fay Richardson | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.