OLD PHAROSIANS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required