CASTLEHAVEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £918.59k £478.80k £1.25m £1.09m £1.01m
Total expenditure £981.06k £459.67k £1.01m £1.27m £891.65k
Income from government contracts £67.52k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £499.68k £128.95k £128.03k £121.83k £139.01k
Income - Donations and legacies £839.72k N/A £428.20k £452.85k £587.96k
Income - Other trading activities £35.07k N/A £304 £632.80k £422.36k
Income - Charitable activities £844 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £42.96k N/A £821.90k £426 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £119
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £981.06k N/A £507.74k £626.74k £447.18k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £3.25k £0 £440.62k
Expenditure - Governance £3.25k N/A £3.25k £4.45k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £494.78k £647.34k £3.85k