THE DORKING CONCERTGOERS SOCIETY

Charity number: 295839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 30 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 30 December 2016 On time Download