CHARITY OF SIDNEY ARTHUR HARRIS FOR CHURCHYARD

Charity number: 296482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.08k £12.40k £2.82k £16.97k £11.65k
Total expenditure £3.99k £3.97k £4.26k £3.72k £3.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A