COMBE ST NICHOLAS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 296563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £11.59k £14.53k £9.61k £12.55k £10.51k
Total expenditure £11.27k £8.98k £10.57k £10.13k £8.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A