Trustees COMBE ST NICHOLAS VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 296563
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Otto Charles Verrinder | Chair | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Roberta Jean Boud | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Penelope Ann Croucher | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Jacqueline Shorey | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Yvonne Lilian Froelich | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Paul Croucher | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Georgina Ann Vye | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
Lynden Rita Ann Gage | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Heather Jean Margetts | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID COBBLEDICK | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Mavis Pargeter | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Wale | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Annette Mary HUNT | Trustee | 05 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Veronica Naomi Elizabeth HAWKINS | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
Alan Romney Johnston | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.