BALCARRES HERITAGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 296766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 06 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 09 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 09 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 09 January 2017 On time Download