BALCARRES HERITAGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 296766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £235.43k £193.93k £226.90k £211.88k £273.16k
Total expenditure £231.76k £224.31k £201.53k £291.85k £249.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A