Accounts and annual returns WOODHURST VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 297010
Charity reporting is overdue by 370 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 March 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 370 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 November 2020 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 August 2019 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required