Trustees KATHARINE HOUSE HOSPICE TRUST
Charity number: 297099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Tim Jenner | Chair | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Catherine Tutt | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Benjamin Walmsley | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David Whittingham | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Dobbs | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Samuel Shadbolt | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Nicholas Jones | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Lindsey Bowser | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Geraldine Burke | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.