Financial history WEST BERKSHIRE MARRIAGE GUIDANCE TRUST

Charity number: 297187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £10.86k £10.93k £10.99k £11.16k £10.88k
Total expenditure £12.81k £22.92k £12.98k £13.06k £23.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A