Trustees THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION SOMERSET

Charity number: 297324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Forbes Trustee 02 August 2021
None on record
LINDA CARRINGTON Trustee 10 May 2021
GUIDE ASSOCIATION, YEOVIL DIVISION
Received: On time
SOMERSPIRIT
Received: On time
Linda Sully Trustee 28 March 2021
WILLITON GUIDE AND BROWNIE HEADQUARTERS
Received: On time
Jill Tompkins Trustee 10 April 2020
None on record
Janet Shackleton Trustee 19 February 2020
TONE DIVISION
Received: On time
Hilary Court Trustee 09 September 2019
None on record
Angela Thompson Trustee 11 April 2019
None on record
Angela Brooks Trustee 15 February 2019
CHEDDAR GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Beverley Osborne Trustee 12 April 2018
BUCKHORN WESTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
SOMERSPIRIT
Received: On time
Leila Nicholson Trustee 19 January 2017
None on record
Sandra Verrier Trustee 23 January 2016
TAUNTON DIVISION GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CLAIRE EDMONDS Trustee 07 November 2012
None on record