TAVISTOCK FEDERATED PTA

Charity number: 297532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 August 2019 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 08 October 2016 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required