TAVISTOCK FEDERATED PTA

Charity number: 297532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £10.62k £6.04k £4.92k £4.43k £3.85k
Total expenditure £10.69k £4.68k £3.49k £8.56k £1.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A