PEPPER POT CENTRE

Charity number: 297952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £197.84k £191.35k £210.69k £195.71k £187.51k
Total expenditure £194.76k £193.37k £185.62k £207.38k £214.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £110.38k £110.38k £110.00k £110.00k £111.00k