Trustees PEPPER POT CENTRE

Charity number: 297952
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eve Allison Trustee 26 January 2016
None on record
Jules Walter Trustee 14 January 2014
None on record
Ferdinand Maxwell Trustee 14 January 2014
None on record
JULIE ANNE MILLS Trustee 15 March 2013
THE CAMPDEN CHARITIES TRUSTEE
Received: On time
HOWARD JEFFREY Trustee 21 January 2013
None on record
HAROLD ROACH Trustee 24 December 2011
None on record
DOREEN WEATHERHEAD Trustee
None on record