Financial history BRISTOL INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 298035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £111.83k £172.88k £88.45k £94.65k £121.84k
Total expenditure £85.75k £86.91k £97.17k £110.50k £82.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.63k