PEGWELL AND DISTRICT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 298233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required