PEGWELL AND DISTRICT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 298233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.40k £1.83k £1.31k £2.06k £342
Total expenditure £4.66k £2.20k £1.85k £2.35k £670
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A