UNIVERSAL PRAYER GROUP MINISTRY

Charity number: 298368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 September 2017 On time Download