UNIVERSAL PRAYER GROUP MINISTRY

Charity number: 298368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.98m £1.85m £1.92m £1.87m £1.46m
Total expenditure £1.71m £1.65m £1.68m £1.72m £1.27m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.83m £1.70m £1.51m £1.46m £1.40m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £138.14k £125.53k £380.41k £372.94k £38.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £28.00k £28.30k £19.35k
Income - Other £10.77k £21.37k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.59m £1.65m £658.65k £1.61m £1.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £104.19k £0 £356.79k £82.30k £569
Expenditure - Governance £20.42k £18.87k £0 £28.16k £34.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £20.42k £0 £668.55k £28.16k £34.83k