CANTERBURY UMBRELLA

Charity number: 298480
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £99.59k £101.74k £120.92k £111.83k £111.97k
Total expenditure £118.94k £119.88k £116.38k £117.56k £120.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A