inHope (Bristol) Limited

Charity number: 298528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Folashade Adeniyi Trustee 08 March 2021 None on record
ANDREW STREET Chair
COMMUNITY INITIATIVES SOUTH WEST LIMITED Received: On time
SIXTY-ONE Received: On time
SPEAR BRISTOL Recently registered
KNOWLE WEST BAPTIST CHURCH Received: On time
BRISTOL INTERNATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
PRODIGAL ARTS Received: On time
FEEDING BRISTOL Received: On time
THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
John Dixon Trustee 20 October 2013 None on record
Granville Sykes Trustee 03 October 2016
HOPE'S PLACE Received: On time
Catherine Emma Carne Trustee 10 May 2021 None on record
Dr Lindsay Kay Smith Trustee 08 March 2021 None on record
Spencer Crowder Trustee 15 October 2018 None on record
Owen Vermeylen Mason Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record